CA SB600 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 282, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 282, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51 of the Civil Code, relating to discrimination.
Title
Discrimination: citizenship: language: immigration status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-24 - Assembly - SB 600 Pan Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 63 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB600 Pan (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB600 Pan (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 282, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 2569.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 30). |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1116.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 983.) (May 12). |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |