CA SB6 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 659, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65913.4 of, and to add and repeal Section 65852.24 of, the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local planning: housing: commercial zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB6 Caballero et al. Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 6 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Wicks (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB6 Caballero et al (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 659, Statutes of 2022.
2022-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2022-09-06 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2022-08-29SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 5228.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2022-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2022-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2022-08-25AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2022-08-25AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2022-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-08-15AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2022-08-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (August 11).
2022-08-03AssemblyAugust 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2022-06-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-08-23AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-08-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 1236.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1178.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-10SenateMay 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 986.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2021-03-26SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2021-03-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 479.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2021-03-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-03-05SenateSet for hearing March 11.
2021-01-28SenateReferral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F., HOUSING, and JUD.
2020-12-08Senate(Corrected December 9).
2020-12-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65852.24Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code65913.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB6
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB6#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB6#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB6#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB6#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB6#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB6#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB6#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB6#92ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB6#91CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB6
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB6

Bill Comments

feedback