CA SB6 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 455, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 455, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.91 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB6 Hueso et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 6 Hueso Third Reading Urgency By GARCIA, E (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB6 Hueso et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 6 Hueso Third Reading Urgency By GARCIA, E (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB6 Hueso et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 455, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2992.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3412.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | June 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | June 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 582.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Published March 29 at 9 p.m. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 348.) (March 13). |
2017-03-13 | Senate | (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 348.) (March 13) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Motion to place on APPR. suspense file failed. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 13. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | March 6 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 6. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 192.) (February 14). |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Set for hearing February 14. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 130.) (January 31). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Set for hearing January 31. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUMAN S. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12012.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 13300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 13307 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 13308 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 13309 | New Code | See Bill Text |