CA SB598 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 492, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 492, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 102400, 102401, 102402, and 102403 of, to add Sections 102398, 102399, 102411, 102412, 102413, 102414, 102415, 102416, 102417, and 102418 to, and to repeal and add Sections 102404, 102405, 102406, 102407, 102408, 102409, and 102410 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Sacramento Regional Transit District: employee relations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB598 Pan et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 598 Pan Senate Third Reading By McCarty (Y: 67 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB598 Pan et al (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 598 Pan Senate Third Reading By McCarty (Y: 67 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB598 Pan et al (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 492, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2549.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 6. Page 2890.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1333.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1197.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 860.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 671.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 102398 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102399 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102411 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102412 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102413 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102414 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102415 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102416 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102417 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 102418 | New Code | See Bill Text |