CA SB598 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Chapter 23.5 (commencing with Section 7540) of Division 7 of Title 1 of the Government Code, relating to public agency financial reporting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open Financial Statements Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB598 Moorlach et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 598 Moorlach Senate Third Reading By Obernolte (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB598 Moorlach (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13 Veto sustained.
2020-01-13 Stricken from file.
2019-10-12 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2019-10-12 Vetoed by the Governor.
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2869.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-11SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3346.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-08-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and A. & A.R.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1256.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1104.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 772.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 714.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and G.O.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code7540Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback