CA SB598 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 248, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 248, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 6018.10 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and use taxes: consumer designation: all volunteer fire department.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-20 - Senate - Special Consent #6 SB598 Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Assembly - SB 598 Hill Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB598 Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Assembly - SB 598 Hill Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB598 Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 248, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2434.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 840.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 524.) (April 8). |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6018.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |