CA SB596 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4439.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4439.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12301.18 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to in-home supportive services.
Title
In-home supportive services: additional higher energy allowance.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB596 Stern Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Assembly - SB 596 Stern Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB596 Stern (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Assembly - SB 596 Stern Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB596 Stern (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-29 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4439.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 304, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5221.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | July 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3167.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3141.) (January 23). |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | January 21 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3079.) (January 13). |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Set for hearing January 13. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12301.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |