CA SB596 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 48960) to Chapter 6 of Part 27 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to civics education.
Title
Civics education: Student Empowerment Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB596 Stern et al. Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 596 Stern Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB596 Stern (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 596 Stern Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB596 Stern (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2017-09-28 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-09-28 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 3004.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3026.) |
2017-09-15 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2982.) Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 3480.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 959.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 848.) (April 26). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33000.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48960 | New Code | See Bill Text |