CA SB595 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 650, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 28840) to Chapter 3 of Part 2 of Division 10 of the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Sections 149.6, 30102.5, 30891, 30911, 30915, 30916, 30918, 30920, 30922, and 30950.3 of, and to add Sections 30914.7 and 30923 to, the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Metropolitan Transportation Commission: toll bridge revenues: BART Inspector General: Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority: high-occupancy toll lanes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB595 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 595 Beall Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 43 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB595 Beall (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 650, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-21SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
2017-09-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2929.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 31. Page 3274.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-08AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-08AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-09-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-19AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (July 13).
2017-07-10AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1332.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1187.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 857.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-18SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-04-06SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14032.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code14461Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code28840New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code149.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code1800Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code30102.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code30891Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code30911Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code30914.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code30915Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code30916Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code30918Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code30920Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code30922Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code30923New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code30950.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback