CA SB595 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 595, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 595, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 523 of the Harbors and Navigation Code, and to amend Section 6302.1 of, and to add Sections 6302.3 and 6302.4 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to tidelands and submerged lands.
Title
Tidelands and submerged lands: removal of vessels.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB595 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-22 - Assembly - SB 595 Wolk Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB595 Wolk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-22 - Assembly - SB 595 Wolk Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB595 Wolk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 595, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-30 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2145.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-22 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2511.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-15 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-14 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-07-13 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 13). | |
2011-06-29 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2011-06-23 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2046.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 2046.) | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. | |
2011-06-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1174.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-17 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-05-06 | Set for hearing May 16. | |
2011-05-03 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-02 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 765.) (April 26). | |
2011-04-15 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-04-04 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-03-31 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 416.) (March 22). | |
2011-03-11 | Set for hearing March 22. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Harbors and Navigation Code | 523 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 6302.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 6302.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 6302.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 6302.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 6302.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |