CA SB593 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 12 (commencing with Section 53170) to Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential units for tourist or transient use: transient residential hosting platforms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01SenateDied on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2015-06-10SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator McGuire.
2015-05-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 982.) (May 13).
2015-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2015-05-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2015-05-05SenateMay 6 hearing postponed by committee.
2015-04-29SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2015-04-24SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2015-04-22SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2015-04-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 732.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2015-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 21.
2015-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. (Corrected April 10).
2015-03-12SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2015-03-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
2015-02-27SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53170New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code7507Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code7508Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_593&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_593_bill_20150227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_593_bill_20150406_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_593_bill_20150429_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_593_bill_20150506_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_593_bill_20150610_amended_sen_v95.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_593_vote_20150421_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_593_vote_20150506_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_593_vote_20150513_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback