CA SB592 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-30 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-30 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.6 (commencing with Section 13996.85) to Part 4.7 of Division 1 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to trade promotion, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Trade promotion of California ports.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Sen. Ellen Corbett [D] | Asm. Paul Fong [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB592 Price Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB592 Price Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 12). |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1106.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1017.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 388.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13996.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |