CA SB586 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 241 and 243 of the Penal Code, relating to assault and battery.
Title
Assault and battery of a federal peace officer.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2017-04-19 | Senate | April 18 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 748.) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 241 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 243 | Amended Code | Citation Text |