CA SB586 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 123835 and 123850 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 14093.06, 14094.2, and 14094.3 of, and to add Article 2.985 (commencing with Section 14094.4) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to children's services.
Title
Children's services.
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Hernandez [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB586 Hernandez Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 586 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 586 Hernandez Senate Third Reading ByA& A.R. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB586 Hernandez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 586 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 586 Hernandez Senate Third Reading ByA& A.R. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB586 Hernandez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5474.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 5437.) |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Set for hearing August 25. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5326.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6079.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5956.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2016-08-10 | Assembly | August 10 set for second hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-08-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | July 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1207.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1156.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 758.) (April 22). |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 123835 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 123850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14093.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14094.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14094.24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14094.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14094.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |