CA SB583 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-30 - June 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-30 - June 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2263, 2264, 2265, 2268, and 2401 of, and to add Sections 2263.1 and 2271 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: Voter registration: California New Motor Voter Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB583 Newman (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Assembly | June 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and TRANS. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1324.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1197.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 3. Page 942.) (April 27). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 755.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2263 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2263.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 2264 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2265 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2268 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2271 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 2401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |