CA SB583 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 51226.10 to the Education Code, relating to pupil curriculum.
Title
Pupil curriculum: model curriculum: financial literacy.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] | Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB583 Stone et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB583 Stone et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1346.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1080.) (May 15). |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 848.) (April 26). |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51225.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51226.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |