CA SB580 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-15 - Approved by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-15 - Approved by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3751, 4061, 4063, and 17422 of the Family Code, relating to child support.
Title
Child support: health insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-28 - Senate - Special Consent #28 SB580 Wright (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - SB 580 Wright Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - SENATE 3RD READING SB580 WRIGHT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - SB 580 Wright Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - SENATE 3RD READING SB580 WRIGHT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-07-06 | Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2010-06-28 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4099.) To enrollment. | |
2010-06-23 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-21 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-06-21 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5746.) To Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-15 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |
2010-06-07 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-02-18 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2010-01-25 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-01-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2708.) To Assembly. | |
2010-01-15 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-01-14 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |
2010-01-13 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-01-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2655.) | |
2010-01-05 | Set for hearing January 12. | |
2009-12-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |