CA SB58 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 590.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11019.7 of the Government Code, and to add Section 341 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to state government, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal information: social security numbers: Employment Development Department: fraud prevention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB58 Wilk et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 590.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-10SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2021-05-04SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2021-04-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-19SenateApril 19 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2021-03-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-11SenateSet for hearing March 23.
2021-03-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 406.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-02-22SenateSet for hearing March 8.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
2020-12-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11019.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code341New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback