CA SB575 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 25200.21.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hazardous waste facility permits: regulations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2021-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2021-04-07SenateApril 12 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-03-18SenateSet for hearing April 12.
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2021-03-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code25200.21.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback