CA SB574 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 10507.7 of, and to add Section 10507.6 to, the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of California: contracts: bidding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB574 Lara et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 574 Lara Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB574 Lara (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2017-10-15 Vetoed by the Governor.
2017-09-22SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2997.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-15SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3408.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-08AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-08AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-09-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (September 1).
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-06-28AssemblyJune 28 set forfirst hearing. Further hearing to be set.
2017-06-15AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and A. & A.R.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1350.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1187.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-04-17SenateApril 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 620.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Contract Code10507.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback