CA SB573 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 108, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 31108.3 and 31752.1 to the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dogs and cats: microchip implants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 573 Chang Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB573 Chang Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB573 Chang (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 108, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-18 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-08SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2020-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-30SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5282.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2020-08-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18).
2020-08-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-27AssemblyJuly 27 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2020-02-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2020-02-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-07-03AssemblyJuly 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1339.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1103.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-22SenateApril 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 552.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-15SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on HOUSING.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code31108.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code31752.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback