CA SB573 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 7.7 (commencing with Section 11795) to Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Statewide open data portal.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB573 Pan (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB573 Pan (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and P. & C.P. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1324.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1156.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 28). |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11795 | New Code | See Bill Text |