CA SB573 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 832.7 of the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-03 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |
2011-04-12 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-04-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 832.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |