CA SB570 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 543, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 543, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1798.29 and 1798.82 of the Civil Code, relating to personal information.
Title
Personal information: privacy: breach.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB570 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 570 Jackson Senate Third Reading By CHAU (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB570 Jackson (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 570 Jackson Senate Third Reading By CHAU (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB570 Jackson (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 543, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 2. Page 2501.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2841.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1119.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 960.) (May 11). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 819.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |