CA SB57 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3217 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 714 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to natural gas, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Natural gas storage: moratorium.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Asm. Dante Acosta [R] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] |
Asm. Matt Dababneh [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB57 Stern et al. Urgency Clause Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB57 Stern et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB57 Stern et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Stern. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1283.) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Stern. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 1283.) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1177.) (May 25). |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | (Corrected May 2). |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 621.) (April 4). |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | March 21 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 172.) (February 9). |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Set for hearing February 9. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Read first time. |
2016-12-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 8. |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3217 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 714 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1305 | New Code | See Bill Text |