CA SB565 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 218, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 218, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5260 and 5270.15 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health: involuntary commitment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 565 Portantino Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB565 Portantino (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB565 Portantino (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 218, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2769.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | July 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 907.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 559.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5256.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5270.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |