CA SB564 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 388, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 388, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 130068 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to hospitals.
Title
Hospitals: seismic compliance: O’Connor Hospital and Santa Clara Valley Medical Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB564 Cortese Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Assembly - SB 564 Cortese Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Assembly - SB 564 Cortese Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB564 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Assembly - SB 564 Cortese Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Assembly - SB 564 Cortese Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB564 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 388, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2524.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2815.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-19 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Senate. | |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2278.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 887.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 533.) (March 17). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 130068 | New Code | See Bill Text |