CA SB562 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Title 22.2 (commencing with Section 100600) to the Government Code, relating to health care coverage, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Healthy California Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB562 Lara et al (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1399.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 2 p.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1187.) (May 25).
2017-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-04-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 886.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-04-05SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-29SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code100600New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback