CA SB562 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1657 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to dentists.
Title
Dentists: mobile or portable dental units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB562 Galgiani Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Assembly - SB 562 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SB562 Galgiani (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Assembly - SB 562 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SB562 Galgiani (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2371.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3137.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2938.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 810.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 719.) (April 29). |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 638.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1657 | Amended Code | Citation Text |