CA SB561 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 13023.5 of the Penal Code, relating to Internet crime statistics.
Title
Internet crimes: data collection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB561 Corbett Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-21 - Assembly - SB 561 Corbett Senate Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Assembly - SB 561 Corbett Senate Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB561 Corbett (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-21 - Assembly - SB 561 Corbett Senate Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Assembly - SB 561 Corbett Senate Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB561 Corbett (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-23 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4759.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-21 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-21 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6060.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-16 | Read third time and amended. (Page 5943.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-13 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-09 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2012-08-09 | Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-08-06 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to unfinished business. | |
2012-07-03 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-07-02 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-07-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5562.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-28 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-27 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). | |
2012-06-06 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-28 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-21 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-13 | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and H. & C.D. | |
2011-06-09 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. | |
2011-04-25 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-04-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 703.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-04-12 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 560.) (April 5). | |
2011-03-31 | Set for hearing April 5. | |
2011-03-29 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-18 | Set for hearing March 29. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1367.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1367.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13023.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |