CA SB560 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 410, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 410, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8386 and 8387 of, and to add Section 776.5 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications.
Title
Wildfire mitigation plans: deenergizing of electrical lines: notifications: mobile telephony service providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB560 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 560 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB560 McGuire (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 560 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB560 McGuire (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 410, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2886.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 2873.) |
2019-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2808.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3258.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | July 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1030.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 903.) (May 1). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 776.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8386 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8387 | Amended Code | Citation Text |