CA SB56 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23104.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: retail licensees: beer returns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-07 - Senate - Special Consent SB56 Mendoza (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Assembly - SB 56 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By SALAS (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB56 Mendoza (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Assembly - SB 56 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By SALAS (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB56 Mendoza (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2017-10-05 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-05 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2582.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2956.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 5). |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1146.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Published May 16 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1006.) (May 9). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | April 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22503.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23104.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23396.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23792 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |