CA SB56 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 696, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 696, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3073.1 of, and to add Sections 3075.5, 3075.6, and 3075.7 to, the Labor Code, relating to apprenticeships.
Title
Apprenticeship oversight.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB56 Corbett Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Assembly - SB 56 Corbett Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB56 Corbett (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Assembly - SB 56 Corbett Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB56 Corbett (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 696, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m. | |
2011-09-01 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2235.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-30 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 2687.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17). | |
2011-06-23 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2011-05-05 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-05 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 876.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-04-12 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-11 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-04-01 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2011-03-09 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 306.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-01 | Set for hearing March 9. | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2011-01-03 | Read first time. | |
2010-12-22 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 21. | |
2010-12-21 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3070 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3073.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3075.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 3075.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 3075.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |