CA SB56 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16809.4 of, and to add Article 2.82 (commencing with Section 14087.98) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health plans.
Title
Health plans: joint ventures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB56 Alquist (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 56 Alquist Senate Third Reading By MONNING (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - SENATE 3RD READING SB56 ALQUIST (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 56 Alquist Senate Third Reading By MONNING (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - SENATE 3RD READING SB56 ALQUIST (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2010-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4892.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-24 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 6516.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.) | |
2010-06-30 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-06-16 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |
2010-06-03 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-02-11 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-01-28 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-01-28 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 2726.) To Assembly. | |
2010-01-25 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-01-21 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 2693.) | |
2010-01-20 | Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2010-01-11 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-28 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4. Page 636.) | |
2009-04-14 | Set for hearing April 22. | |
2009-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-01-29 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-01-22 | Read first time. | |
2009-01-21 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | |
2009-01-20 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |