CA SB559 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4850 of the Labor Code, relating to workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' compensation: public employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB559 Block (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | July 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 3. Page 558.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1702.) (April 8). |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 4850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |