CA SB557 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jun 26 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1369.5 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal proceedings: mental competence: expert reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB557 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-05-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 824.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 526.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1369.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback