CA SB557 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 285, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 13 (commencing with Section 49580) to Chapter 9 of Part 27 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 114079 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to food safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food donations and pupil meals: schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-05 - Senate - Special Consent SB557 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 557 Hernandez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB557 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Education] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 285, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-25 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-05SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2480.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2854.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-08-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-08-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
2017-08-23AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-22AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2017-06-13AssemblyJune 13 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
2017-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-15SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1073.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 848.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-17SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 5).
2017-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code49580New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code114079Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback