CA SB557 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 420, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 420, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25503.6 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: tied-house restrictions: advertising.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB557 Hall Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 557 Hall Senate Third Reading By GRAY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB557 Hall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 557 Hall Senate Third Reading By GRAY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB557 Hall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 420, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2563.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2846.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1062.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 960.) (May 11). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 796.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25502.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |