CA SB557 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 262, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Title 5.3 (commencing with Section 13750) of Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to family justice centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family justice centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent #8 SB557 Kehoe (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Assembly - SB 557 Kehoe Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB557 Kehoe (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-09-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 262, Statutes of 2011.
2011-09-06 Approved by the Governor.
2011-08-25 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2011-08-22 Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2017.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2011-08-17 Ordered to special consent calendar.
2011-07-14 In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2011-07-14 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2345.) Ordered to the Senate.
2011-07-11 Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2011-07-07 Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2011-07-06 From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2011-06-22 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-06-15 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2011-06-09 Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2011-06-02 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2011-06-01 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1218.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2011-05-27 Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-26 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1119.) (May 26).
2011-05-25 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-05-20 Set for hearing May 26 in APPR. pending receipt.
2011-05-19 Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2011-05-17 Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-16 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 950.) (May 10).
2011-05-02 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-04-29 Set for hearing May 10.
2011-04-25 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Corrected April 27.)
2011-04-05 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-04-04 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 495.) (March 29).
2011-03-16 Set for hearing March 29.
2011-03-03 Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2011-02-18 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2011-02-17 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code13750New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_557&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_bill_20110217_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_bill_20110405_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_bill_20110425_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_bill_20110502_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_bill_20110517_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_bill_20110527_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_bill_20110615_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_bill_20110707_amended_asm_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_bill_20110824_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_bill_20110906_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_vote_20110329_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_vote_20110510_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_vote_20110526_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_vote_20110601_1100AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_vote_20110621_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_vote_20110628_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_vote_20110714_1121AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_557_vote_20110822_0237PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback