CA SB552 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7195 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 115921, 115922, and 115925 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public safety.
Title
Public safety: pools and spas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB552 Newman et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Assembly - SB 552 Newman Senate Third Reading By Bains (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - SB 552 Newman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB552 Newman (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Assembly - SB 552 Newman Senate Third Reading By Bains (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - SB 552 Newman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB552 Newman (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b)(1) suspended. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-20 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. | |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6319.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7). |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and H. & C.D. |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3020.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 2958.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 2950.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Set for hearing January 9 in HOUSING pending receipt. |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 8. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and HOUSING. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7195 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 115921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 115922 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 115925 | Amended Code | Citation Text |