CA SB552 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 773, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 773, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 116681 and 116682 of, and to add Section 116686 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to water.
Title
Public water systems: disadvantaged communities: consolidation or extension of service: administrative and managerial services.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB552 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-26 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 552 Wolk Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 552 Wolk Senate Third Reading Amend By ARAMBULA Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB552 Wolk (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-26 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 552 Wolk Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 552 Wolk Senate Third Reading Amend By ARAMBULA Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB552 Wolk (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 773, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5494.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-26 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 5456.) |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Set for hearing August 26. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5326.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6130.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 21. Page 5990.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 14). |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W., P., & W. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 27). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1205.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1156.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 858.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116325.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116681 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116682 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116686 | New Code | See Bill Text |