CA SB550 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 812, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 812, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3543.8 of the Government Code, relating to public school employment.
Title
Public school employment: meeting and negotiating: legal actions: settlement offer: attorney’s fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB550 Pan Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB550 Pan Concurrence Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB550 Pan Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 550 Pan Senate Third Reading By RODRIGUEZ (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB550 Pan (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB550 Pan Concurrence Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB550 Pan Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 550 Pan Senate Third Reading By RODRIGUEZ (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB550 Pan (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 812, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2795.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2795.) |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Pan. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2790.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 3154.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 18). |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and JUD. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1245.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Published May 9 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 945.) (May 2). |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3543.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |