CA SB549 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 284, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 284, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 591 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Public utilities: redirection of moneys authorized for maintenance, safety, or reliability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Senate - Special Consent SB549 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 549 Bradford Senate Third Reading By IRWIN (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB549 Bradford (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 549 Bradford Senate Third Reading By IRWIN (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB549 Bradford (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 284, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2479.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2843.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 767.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 429.) (March 21). |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 591 | New Code | See Bill Text |