CA SB545 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3008, 3106, 3203, and 3234 of, to add Section 3215.5 to, to repeal Section 3451 of, and to repeal and add Section 3450 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | May 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 593.) (April 14). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected March 11). |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3215.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3234 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3451 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |