CA SB544 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 26100 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis testing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB544 Laird et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-04-05SenateApril 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2021-03-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 574.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-11SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26100Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback