CA SB543 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 448, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 448, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 144, 205, 210, 5000, 5015.6, 5076, 5076.1, 5510, 5517, 5552.5, 5620, 5621, 5622, 6510, 6710, 6714, 6763.1, 7000.5, 7011, 7200, 7215.6, 7885, 7886, 7887, 8710, 18602, 18613, and 18618 of, to add Sections 5063.10 and 6582.2 to, and to add and repeal Section 2674 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to business and professions, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Business and professions: regulatory boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB543 Steinberg By Price (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 543 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By MITCHELL (Y: 65 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - SB 543 Price Senate Third Reading By MITCHELL Amend By MITCHELL Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB543 Price (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 543 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By MITCHELL (Y: 65 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - SB 543 Price Senate Third Reading By MITCHELL Amend By MITCHELL Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB543 Price (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 448, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-09 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2465.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 3113.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-09-06 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-09-02 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2825.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2011-08-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-17 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-06-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1177.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-17 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1014.) (May 16). | |
2011-05-06 | Set for hearing May 16. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 848.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-04-12 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-11 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-04-04 | Set for hearing April 25. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |