CA SB540 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 10.10 (commencing with Section 65620) to Chapter 3 of Division 1 of Title 7 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Workforce Housing Opportunity Zone.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB540 Roth et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 540 Roth Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 70 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB540 Roth et al (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 540 Roth Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 70 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB540 Roth et al (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2960.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 8. Page 3419.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 2826.) |
2017-07-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 7. Page 1383.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1186.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 784.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 623.) (April 5). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19 in EQ. pending receipt. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 627.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | March 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H., GOV. & F., and EQ. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65620 | New Code | See Bill Text |