CA SB540 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 385, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 385, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 651, 1603, 1628.7, 1632, 1695.5, 1725, 1752.3, 1753.4, 1905.2, and 1973 of, to amend and repeal Sections 1901 and 1903 of, to add Section 1611.3 to, to repeal and amend Sections 1601.1 and 1616.5 of, and to repeal and add Section 1742 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to dentistry.
Title
Dentistry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB540 Price Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Assembly - SB 540 Price Senate Third Reading By HAYASHI (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB540 Price (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Assembly - SB 540 Price Senate Third Reading By HAYASHI (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB540 Price (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 385, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-08 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2413.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-07 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-07 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2997.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-09-01 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2771.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-17 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-27 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1245.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-24 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-23 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1086.) (May 23). | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 848.) (May 2). | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-04-12 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-11 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-04-04 | Set for hearing April 25. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |