CA SB54 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 495, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 495, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7282 and 7282.5 of, and to add Chapter 17.25 (commencing with Section 7284) to Division 7 of Title 1 of, the Government Code, and to repeal Section 11369 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement: sharing data.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB54 De León et al. Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 54 De León Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB54 De León et al (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 54 De León Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB54 De León et al (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 495, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-16 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 3017.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 3473.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3458.) |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 5). |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 575.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Published March 30 at 4 a.m. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 349.) (March 13). |
2017-03-13 | Senate | (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 348.) (March 13) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Motion to place on APPR. suspense file failed. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 13. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | March 6 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 6. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 130.) (January 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Set for hearing January 31. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | (Corrected December 6). |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11369 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7282 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7282.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7284 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11369 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 7284 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 885 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 3058.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 3058.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 885 | New Code | See Bill Text |