CA SB54 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3003.5 of, and to add Section 3003.51 to, the Penal Code, relating to sex offenders.
Title
Sex offenders: residency restrictions: petition for
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-04-26 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 741.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2011-04-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-04-05 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2011-03-24 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-01-03 | Read first time. | |
2010-12-17 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 16. | |
2010-12-16 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3003.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3003.51 | New Code | See Bill Text |